Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese, Harlan, against Ramirez, Carlos Mucino, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management351 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions349 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time349 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.