Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Toalson, Clifton, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management350 days |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections With Reduced Filing Fee |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions252 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Supplemental | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal of Does | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.