Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, Jordan David, against Vasquez, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallagher, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management350 days |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections With Reduced Filing Fee |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time350 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Non-Service | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | 30 Day Summons | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.