Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Burnstad, Bryant, against Sanchez, Mireya, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions171 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time171 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy, Filed | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.