Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Herme, Lisa M, against Bland, William, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management350 days |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time483 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | 30 Day Summons | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.