Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Luis Obispo County. This case was filed in San Luis Obispo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Luis Obispo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
On August 2, 2017, Matthew Easterbrook (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc., the California Department of Transportation (“Cal-Trans”), Vince Zorn (“Zorn”), Buddy C...
Judge: Tana L. Coates |
|
August 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
On August 2, 2017, Plaintiff Matthew Easterbrook (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc. (“Inter-Con”), California Department of Transportation (“Cal-Trans”), Vince Zo...
Judge: Tana L. Coates |
|
March 28, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
On August 2, 2017, Plaintiff Matthew Easterbrook (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc. (“Inter-Con”), California Department of Transportation (“Cal-Trans”), Vince Zo...
Judge: Tana L. Coates |
|
November 29, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
On August 2, 2017, Plaintiff Matthew Easterbrook (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc. (“Inter-Con”), California Department of Transportation (“Cal-Trans”), Vince Zo...
Judge: Charles S. Crandall |
|
November 01, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
On August 2, 2017, Plaintiff Matthew Easterbrook (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc. (“Inter-Con”), California Department of Transportation (“Cal-Trans”), Vince Zo...
Judge: Charles S. Crandall |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.