Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brooke, Desire, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hurtado, Diana, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Dougherty, Frank presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
Category(43): Civil Petition For Harassment With Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Equipment Request
Date: November 06, 2017Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order
Date: November 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order Judge: Dougherty, Frank |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment No Fees | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Equipment Request | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | LODGED Order/Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.