Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Young, Allen Lee, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Dougherty, Frank presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2017 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: VOP - Video
Date: January 22, 2018Arraignment: VOP - Video
Date: February 02, 2018Release Order
Date: January 22, 2018Preliminary Examination
Date: December 21, 2017Arraignment: VOP
Date: February 07, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: February 21, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: March 26, 2018Release Order
Date: March 26, 2019Violation of Probation
Date: April 10, 2018Arraignment: VOP
Date: March 05, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: March 12, 2019Progress Report
Date: April 09, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: February 26, 2019Progress Report
Date: May 28, 2019Progress Report
Date: April 02, 2019Violation of Probation
Date: June 04, 2018Progress Report
Date: April 23, 2019Violation of Probation
Date: February 13, 2018Progress Report
Date: April 30, 2019Violation of Probation
Date: January 26, 2018Pre-Preliminary
Date: December 04, 2017Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: November 29, 2017Violation of Probation
Date: May 02, 2018Preliminary Examination
Date: December 11, 2017Preliminary Examination
Date: December 18, 2017Violation of Probation
Date: September 13, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: September 25, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: July 02, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: May 30, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: October 04, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: October 05, 2018Further Proceedings
Date: October 25, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: October 17, 2018Arraignment: VOP
Date: January 08, 2019Violation of Probation
Date: October 09, 2018Further Proceedings
Date: July 03, 2019Hearing: Other
Date: November 06, 2018Violation of Probation
Date: August 09, 2018Progress Report
Date: June 11, 2019Progress Report
Date: June 04, 2019Arraignment: Warrant
Date: June 11, 2019Further Proceedings
Date: July 02, 2019Program Status
Date: November 15, 2018Release Order
Date: November 15, 2018Further Proceedings
Date: June 25, 2019Further Proceedings
Date: October 23, 2018Arraignment: VOP
Date: December 11, 2018Progress Report
Date: July 23, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: January 15, 2019Further Proceedings
Date: October 31, 2018Progress Report
Date: August 27, 2019Progress Report
Date: August 06, 2019Progress Report
Date: July 30, 2019Hearing: Other
Date: October 30, 2018Progress Report
Date: September 10, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: January 22, 2019Court Collections Statement Letter
Date: November 28, 2018Arraignment: VOP
Date: February 05, 2019Progress Report
Date: November 27, 2018Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: December 10, 2018Progress Report
Date: May 07, 2019Progress Report
Date: May 14, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: December 19, 2018Release Order
Date: July 03, 2019Progress Report
Date: October 01, 2019Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: October 03, 2019Progress Report
Date: July 09, 2019Progress Report
Date: October 08, 2019Release Order
Date: October 15, 2019Progress Report
Date: October 15, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: December 18, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: January 29, 2020Arraignment: VOP
Date: August 12, 2020Arraignment: VOP
Date: February 19, 2020Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: November 07, 2019Hearing: Other
Date: November 12, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: November 20, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: July 15, 2020Release Order
Date: August 12, 2020Progress Report
Date: October 22, 2019Arraignment: VOP
Date: June 24, 2020Arraignment: VOP
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment: VOP
Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment: VOP
Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: VOP Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: VOP Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Hansen, Ronald |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: VOP Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: VOP Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment: VOP
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Standing Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19) | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Standing Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.