Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Farley, Johnathan Bernard, Junior, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Dougherty, Frank presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2017 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Progress Report
Date: March 15, 2019Violation of Probation: Contested Hearing
Date: April 08, 2019Violation of Probation
Date: June 21, 2021Proof
Date: December 07, 2018Arraignment: Warrant
Date: April 19, 2021Arraignment: Warrant
Date: July 31, 2019Arraignment: Warrant
Date: December 14, 2018Modification
Date: December 07, 2018Proof
Date: February 08, 2019Progress Report
Date: November 14, 2018Proof
Date: January 04, 2019Progress Report
Date: November 09, 2018Proof
Date: June 01, 2018Proof
Date: March 13, 2018Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: November 07, 2018Progress Report
Date: September 21, 2018Proof
Date: June 22, 2018Release Order
Date: May 25, 2018Proof
Date: May 25, 2018Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: May 24, 2018Proof
Date: April 10, 2018Proof
Date: March 27, 2018Pre-Preliminary
Date: December 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Progress Report
Judge: Foster, David |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof
Judge: Foster, David |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Progress Report | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Further Proceedings Judge: Foster, David |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Progress Report | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | County Fees Adjustment Pursuant to AB1869 | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation: Appear | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Violation of Probation Judge: Foster, David |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation is revoked
Judge: Foster, David |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant Judge: Kirihara, John |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.