Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Powell, Taraleika Chauntena, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Dougherty, Frank presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: November 27, 2017Pre-Trial Conference
Date: December 04, 2017Pre-Trial Conference
Date: January 09, 2018Arraignment: Warrant
Date: March 15, 2021Arraignment: Warrant
Date: October 21, 2019Sentencing Hearing
Date: February 04, 2019Release Order
Date: January 16, 2018Pre-Trial Conference
Date: December 19, 2017Pre-Trial Conference
Date: December 12, 2017Pre-Trial Conference
Date: December 11, 2017Arraignment: Complaint
Date: November 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Courtesy Notice - Warrant Arraignment Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation: Appear | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Sentencing Hearing Judge: Hashimoto, Roy |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant: Issued | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: Mewhinney, Douglas V. |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Mewhinney, Douglas V. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.