Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Reinhart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference re: Violation of Probation
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference re: Violation of Probation
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
F/P: Possible Violation of Probation due to new case filing
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.