Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Duerksen, Marva Jenell filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2017 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time467 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exparte Petition for Final Discharge and Order cc emailed Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt of Distributee | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting and for Allowance of Statutory Commissions Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Final Distribution
Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition - Distribution Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting and for Allowance of Statutory Commissions Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Douglas Scott Duerksen | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition (Generic) Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting and for Allowance of Statutory Commissions |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hrg: 7/9/2018; Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.