Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Roeme, Heather, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roeme, Larry, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gamoian, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Attorney Cardenas-Gonzalez making a courtesy appearance for Attorney Tomassian |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Gamoian Minute Order: See Attached | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement Filed | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Return Letter | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.