Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hennesay, Keri Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hennesay, Timothy Scott, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with David C. Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions121 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time220 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment CC's mailed to each party |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Judgment/MSA w/envelopes to FLEX |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminary and Final |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Default Shelf w/judgment |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default as to respondent Timothy Scott Hennesay |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons personal service on 11/06/17 Petition for Dissolution, blnk Response, Ntc of Calendar setting |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution without Children Summons issued _X_Yes ___No |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.