Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Department Of Fair Employment And Housing, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Dept Of State Hospitals, Dba Colinga State Hospital An Agency Of State Of Calif., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2017 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
Order Received for Signature
Date: November 21, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: November 13, 2017Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: March 20, 2018Statement filed
Date: March 20, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 09, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 11, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: November 13, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: November 13, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: November 13, 2017Petition filed
Date: November 01, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: November 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement filed Statement of Repsondent's Compliant with Courts Order |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Certificate of Mailing Attached |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing - In Camera - Pre Pitchess Motion Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Certificate of Mailing Attached |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre Petition to compel compliance Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel Production of records; Tim Martin Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Petition to Compel Compliance |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt Notice Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.