Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
California Farm Management, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hall, Marcus T., against Tapestry Vineyards, Inc., represented by Coulson, Dawn M., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Donald S. Black presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 27, 2016 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time398 days |
Response filed
Date: January 23, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 02, 2017Stipulation Filed
Date: February 07, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 27, 2017Application Filed
Date: February 24, 2017Reply filed
Date: April 06, 2017Demurrer Filed
Date: December 27, 2016Motion filed
Date: March 06, 2017Order filed
Date: April 04, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 08, 2017Opposition filed
Date: April 05, 2017Opposition filed
Date: March 23, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 13, 2017Objection filed
Date: May 18, 2017Motion filed
Date: April 28, 2017Motion filed
Date: April 07, 2017Opposition filed
Date: May 12, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 12, 2017Stipulation Filed
Date: May 26, 2017Reply filed
Date: May 18, 2017Objection filed
Date: May 12, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 25, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 22, 2017Statement filed
Date: November 29, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 12, 2017Objection filed
Date: November 29, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 29, 2018Opposition filed
Date: November 29, 2018Opposition filed
Date: November 29, 2018Order filed
Date: November 29, 2018Objection filed
Date: November 29, 2018Objection filed
Date: December 07, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: November 29, 2018Motion filed
Date: April 19, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 06, 2017Answer Filed
Date: December 12, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: October 27, 2016Reply filed
Date: March 28, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 17, 2017Opposition filed
Date: September 14, 2018Petition filed
Date: February 28, 2017Request for Judical Notice
Date: April 28, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 27, 2016Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: November 29, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: September 14, 2018Statement filed
Date: April 07, 2017Notice Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: February 24, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 28, 2017Opposition filed
Date: November 29, 2018Summons issued and filed
Date: October 27, 2016Proof of Service
Date: November 23, 2016Declaration Filed
Date: December 27, 2016Civil case cover sheet
Date: October 27, 2016Amended Document Filed
Date: January 23, 2017Proof of Service
Date: November 10, 2016Declaration Filed
Date: February 03, 2017Notice Filed
Date: December 27, 2016Proof of Service
Date: December 27, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 24, 2017Notice Filed
Date: February 24, 2017Notice Filed
Date: November 16, 2016Declaration Filed
Date: February 28, 2017Notice Filed
Date: March 06, 2017Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2017Notice Filed
Date: March 28, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: February 24, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 28, 2017Notice Filed
Date: May 04, 2017Notice Filed
Date: April 04, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: April 28, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: May 12, 2017Proof of Service
Date: February 24, 2017Notice Filed
Date: May 12, 2017Notice Filed
Date: February 28, 2017Proof of Service
Date: April 07, 2017Notice Filed
Date: May 11, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 12, 2017Proof of Service
Date: April 28, 2017List filed
Date: September 14, 2018Motion filed
Date: September 14, 2018Proof of Service
Date: December 20, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: November 29, 2018Notice Filed
Date: November 29, 2018Proof of Service
Date: December 07, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: December 07, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 13, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: December 13, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 20, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 15, 2019Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Reply filed
Date: January 23, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 16, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 01, 2019Proof of Service
Date: November 29, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: December 20, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 28, 2018Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 02, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 11, 2019Proof of Service
Date: December 28, 2018Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: January 14, 2019Order filed
Date: January 15, 2019Notice Filed
Date: January 16, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 24, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 14, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: May 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply filed Reply; Notice of Non Opposition to motion to file Amendment to its answer |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
HRG 1-30-2019 Opposition for Motions for leave to file Cross Complaints Opposition filed |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( minute order and order ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (1/16/19 ) . Parties served: ( ) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.01.16 Notice of Ruling on Jan 15 Ex Parte Notice Filed of Ruling on Defendants' Ex Parte Application |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order filed Order On Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Judge: Black, Donald |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
2019.01.14 Tapestry Jury Fee Form Deposit, payment,disbursment Jury Deposit on behalf of Tapestry Vineyards, Inc. (17CECG03922) |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.