Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bridge, Michael Ray, Bridge, Sheryl D., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Wyrick, Robert A, against Guarantee Real Estate, A California Corporation, Higginbotham, Kathy, Higginbotham, Ken, represented by Balch, Marisa L., Pool, Don J., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management118 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time531 days |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: April 02, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 23, 2019Request Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Notice Filed
Date: January 16, 2018Request Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Request Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Request Filed
Date: February 07, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: December 07, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 16, 2018Notice Filed
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: March 26, 2018Notice Filed
Date: January 16, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 18, 2018Stipulation Filed
Date: July 18, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 08, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 21, 2018Reply filed
Date: February 14, 2018Objection filed
Date: February 14, 2018Reply filed
Date: February 14, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 13, 2018Opposition filed
Date: February 07, 2018Opposition filed
Date: February 07, 2018ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: January 30, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 29, 2018Reply filed
Date: January 23, 2018Reply filed
Date: January 23, 2018Opposition filed
Date: January 17, 2018Opposition filed
Date: January 17, 2018Opposition filed
Date: January 17, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: January 16, 2018Motion filed
Date: January 16, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: January 16, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: January 16, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 07, 2017Request Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 10, 2018Motion filed
Date: January 10, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 07, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: December 07, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: December 06, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 06, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: December 06, 2017Civil Complaint filed
Date: October 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference Set in 502 at 1/23/19 hearing Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review 2019-04-02 Request for Dismissal |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Dismissal Hearing is set for 5/28/19 at 3:30pm in dept. 402 |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement filed Treated as an Unconditional Settlement |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference Moved from Dept 403 to Dept 502 re: Judge McGuire unavailable Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Certificate of Mailing Attached |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.