Video Symphony Llc,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Flanagan Michael G.,
against
Ainsworth Scott,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Details for
Video Symphony Llc v. Ainsworth Scott
Case Events for
Video Symphony Llc v. Ainsworth Scott
Date
Type
Description
January 21, 2021
Docket Event
Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of ; Filed by: Clerk
January 21, 2021
Docket Event
Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)
January 21, 2021
Docket Event
On the Complaint filed by VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action
January 21, 2021
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
January 21, 2021
Hearing
Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740
October 27, 2020
Hearing
Updated -- Event scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension) to Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740
October 27, 2020
Docket Event
Updated -- Event scheduled for 01/21/2021 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension) to Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740
July 13, 2020
Docket Event
RETURNED MAIL Certificate of Mailing & Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: (VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC) (Plaintiff)
July 13, 2020
Docket Event
RETURNED MAIL Certificate of Mailing & Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: (VIDEO SYMPHONY LLC) (Plaintiff)
June 17, 2020
Docket Event
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk