Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case against Connor Michael Conway, represented by Courtney E Griffin, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Hanford - Traffic with Donna Tarter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Tarter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseHanford - Traffic |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2018 | Action | Traffic School Completion - Submitted | |
November 17, 2017 | Action | Traffic School Requested - Fees Attached | |
November 17, 2017 | Action | Traffic School due date | |
October 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Donna Tarter |
|
October 19, 2017 | Action | Minute Order | |
September 29, 2017 | Action | Minute Order | |
September 26, 2017 | Action | Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 -Judge Barnes | |
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Manuel Vierra |
|
May 30, 2017 | Action | Promise to Appear | |
January 26, 2017 | Action | Notice to Appear Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.