Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Branish, Ruby Kay, filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time102 days |
OSC re Name Change
Date: January 12, 2018Petition for Change of Name and Gender
Date: December 11, 2017Petition Hearing
Date: March 23, 2018OSC re Name Change
Date: December 15, 2017Petition for Change of Name and Gender
Date: January 08, 2018Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement
Date: January 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC Re: Name Change Petition Hearing Name and Gender Change Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Decree | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling All documents are in order and the Petition is granted. The Court will sign the decree provided. |
|
March 23, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
All documents are in order and the Petition is granted. The Court will sign the decree provided.
Judge: Michael P Candela |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Background Check Results Received | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC Re: Name Change and Gender Amended OSC re Name Change and Gender Amended Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change Of Name and Gender Amended Petition for Change of Name and Gender |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
OSC Re: Name Change OSC re Name Change and Gender Judge: Candela, Michael P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.