Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chernabaeff, Samson, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Se, Roberts, David A., against Emerson, James, Goodwin, Tom, International Asset Network, Llc, Physician'S Imaging L.P., Physicians Imaging Visalia, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Tookoian, Robert D, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Diaz, Monica presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management115 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial564 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time40 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 27, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 23, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: January 28, 2019Order filed
Date: May 14, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 28, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: December 19, 2017ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: December 15, 2017Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Date: August 04, 2017Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: September 13, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: August 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 14, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 10, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 17, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: January 28, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: August 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 29, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 06, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: January 28, 2019Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: September 13, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 17, 2019Statement filed
Date: May 17, 2019List filed
Date: May 17, 2019Statement filed
Date: May 17, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: May 10, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 17, 2019List filed
Date: May 17, 2019Response filed
Date: April 08, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 10, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: September 04, 2019List filed
Date: May 17, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: February 14, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 10, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 10, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 20, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: September 04, 2019List filed
Date: May 17, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 27, 2020Statement filed
Date: April 07, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 19, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 05, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: September 04, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 04, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: March 19, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: December 05, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: August 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settled Case Status Conference
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Chambers Work- Pre | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Calendar Setting and Certificate of Mailing **Settled Case Status Conference set for 05/07/20 is continued to 7/17/20** |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address and Phone Number Notice of Change of Address Filed |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement filed Joint Settled Case Status Statement (Copy to #503 4/28/2020) |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing continuance and Certificate of Mailing **Settled Case Status Conference is continued from 4/9/2020 to 5/7/2020** |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment and Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.