Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rice, Shawn Dale, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2012 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.