Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Wabash County, IL, . Wabash County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2023 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWabash County, IL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Oath | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Oath | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.