Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Shelby County, IL, . Shelby County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2023 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationShelby County, IL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.