Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Menard County, IL, . Menard County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMenard County, IL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Oath | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.