Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Menard County, IL, . Menard County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2023 |
CategoryLaw Magistrate: Damages Over $10,000 Up To $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMenard County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons (Returned) | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.