Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Macon County, IL, . Macon County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMacon County, IL |
|
Case Outcome Type8 - Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 |
Case Management Order to be on file or parties to appear on December 1, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., Courtroom 2B for Case Management Conference. Copy of letter to counsel filed. Case mgt conf set for 12/01/2022 at 02:00 in courtroom 2B. Copy of Order mailed August 11, 2022. Case mgt conf set for 12/01/2022 at 02:00 in courtroom 2B. ----------------------------------------------------------------------
Judge: EFH |
||
August 08, 2022 |
Cause assigned to Judge Hubbard for further proceedings.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
August 03, 2022 |
Complaint filed on 08/03/2022.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
August 03, 2022 |
Complaint for Defamation of Character filed by CONNER, FALLON.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.