Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Macon County, IL, . Macon County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMacon County, IL |
|
Case Outcome Type8 - Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 |
Mr. Scully for the Plaintiff. Mr. Kehart present for all Defendants. Agreed Order entered and on file.
Judge: RCB |
||
September 26, 2022 |
Cause continued to further order. ----------------------------------------------------------------------
Judge: RCB |
||
September 23, 2022 |
Proof of Service/Certificate of Service Filed by Scully, Conrad.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
September 23, 2022 |
Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Filed by Scully, Conrad.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
September 01, 2022 |
Notice of RS Entries for 09/01/2022 emailed to LEWIS, REGAN. Notice of RS Entries for 09/01/2022 emailed to SCULLY, CONRAD.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
August 31, 2022 |
In light of Judge Little's retirement, cause temporarily reassigned to Judge Bollinger for the case management conference currently scheduled for 9/26/22 at 1:30pm. The Case Management Conference will take place in courtroom 6B. The Circuit Clerk is directed to send a copy of this docket entry to all parties or their counsel of record ----------------------------------------------------------------------
Judge: RCB |
||
August 09, 2022 |
Proof of Service/Certificate of Service filed by SCULLY, CONRAD.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
August 09, 2022 |
Response to Motion filed by SCULLY, CONRAD.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
June 27, 2022 |
Motion to Dismiss filed by LEWIS, REGAN.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
||
June 09, 2022 |
Proof of Service/Certificate of Service filed by SCULLY, CONRAD.
Judge: UNASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.