Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Insurance, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by O'Dea, James, against Martinez, Denny, represented by Hillison, Robert, Donnelly, Diane, in the jurisdiction of Kane County, IL, . Kane County, IL Superior Courts with Tarter, Todd B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategorySc - Tort - Money Damages ($2,500.01 To $10K) |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKane County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Jury Trial IN PERSON per court order Judge: Tarter, Todd B |
|
March 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference IN PERSON per court order Judge: Tarter, Todd B |
|
March 02, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion Call spanish interputor O'Deay 7083641837 Judge: Tarter, Todd B |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Chief Judge's Office to Provide an In Person Interpreter | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Entered by Judge Tarter | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Chief Judge to Provide Spanish Interpreter |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion; Filed | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail Returned; Filed | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Court Order Sent to | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Jury Trial; Filed
Judge: Tarter, Todd B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.