Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Clarke Mosquito Control Products, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Barrel Accessories And Supply Company, Inc., Basco, Inc., Basco Logistics, Inc., Greif Packaging, Llc, Inhance Technologies Holdings Co-Member, Inc., (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Bartkowicz, Ronald F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Warranty - Jury |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: December 22, 2022Exhibits Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Motion Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Breach Of Warranty Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Motion For Extension Of Time (Scr 323E) Filed
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Summons Served By Special Process Server
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Jury Demand Filed - Fee Paid
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Verified Petition - Filed
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Alw-
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Brief Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Notice Filed
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: August 01, 2023Place On Appeal Calendar - Allowed -
Date: September 08, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-07-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: August 01, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2023File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-07-26T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: August 25, 2023Leave To Appeal - Allowed
Date: August 21, 2023Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.