Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gaston, Shamone A, filed a(n) Petition For Administrative Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs case against Litwitz, Jonathan R, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Kathaleen Lanahan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathaleen Lanahan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Administrative Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: March 14, 2022Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: December 29, 2021Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: November 05, 2022Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: May 09, 2022New Case Filing
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: March 23, 2022Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: July 09, 2022Voluntary Acknowledgment Of Paternity - Filed
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: May 09, 2022Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: May 09, 2022Pet For Admin Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: March 14, 2022Continuance - Allowed -
Date: March 14, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.