Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reyes, Jose Enrique, filed a(n) Petition For Dissolution case against Martinez, Carmen Maria, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Rossana Patricia Fernandez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Order Leave To File -Report Of Proceedings Within 28 Days - Allowed -
Date: June 02, 2022New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Prove Up Set For
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Alias Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2022-02-27T00:00:00Alias Summons - Issued - Paid
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Request Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation To Hear Uncontested Cause In District 3
Date: April 25, 2022Case Off Call
Date: June 02, 2022Judgment
Date: June 02, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Report Or Record Of Proceedings Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Default - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Certificate Of Dissolution Sent
Date: June 02, 2022Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: June 02, 2022New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Alias Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2022-02-27T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.