Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shehadeh, Ali Yaser, filed a(n) case against Lavis, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Elizabeth Loredo-Rivera presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Action Does Not Involve Minor Child/Children
Date: July 26, 2021Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Stipulation To Hear Uncontested Cause Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Prove Up Set For
Date: July 29, 2021Marriage
Date: July 26, 2021Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Parties Have Not Previously Filed A Parentage Petition
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Parties Have Not Previously Filed For Divorce
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: July 29, 2021E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.