Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Milliken Tamara, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by , Chicago Il, 60606, 211 W Wacker Ste 750, Greater Chicago Legal Cli, against Courtney James, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Mary S. Trew presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
CERTIFICATE OF REPRESENTATION BY CIVIL LEGAL SERVICES PROVIDER FILED
Date: July 07, 2021CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: June 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF REPRESENTATION BY CIVIL LEGAL SERVICES PROVIDER FILED
Date: June 14, 2021SCHEDULED DATE
Date: June 14, 2021WAIVER FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: July 07, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00STRIKE FUTURE COURT DATE
Date: June 30, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: May 20, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED - PAID
Date: May 03, 2021PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: July 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF REPRESENTATION BY CIVIL LEGAL SERVICES PROVIDER FILED
Date: May 03, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.