Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brandi Finister, Finister Brandi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by , Palatine Il, 60067, 157N Broadway Fl2, Brady Ann C, against Phillip Piggie, Piggie Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Completion Of Minor Children Parenting Education/ Petitioner - Filed -
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Order Leave To File -Report Of Proceedings Within 28 Days - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Agreed) - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Alias Summons - Issued - Paid
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Certificate & Motion For Default Filed
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Order On Motion To Provide Medical Insurance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Alias Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: March 30, 2022E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Report Or Record Of Proceedings Filed
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Order For Installment Payments Of Judgment
Date: March 30, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: April 02, 2022Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities Judgment Pet/Resp - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: February 15, 2022Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: March 30, 2022Order To Pay Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Petition For Attorney Fees
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: March 30, 2022ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED - PAID
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.