Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gant As Mother And Next B, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ed Fox & Assoc, against Village Of Sauk Village, Luke Officer Gary, Hickman Officer Justin, represented by Ancel, Glink Diamond Bush, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Carrie E. Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Dismiss Entire Cause - Plaintiff -
Date: October 07, 2021Exhibits Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Order Case Disposed
Date: October 07, 2021Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: September 07, 2021Case Management Date Generated
Date: August 03, 2021Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Summons Served - Corporation/Company/Business
Date: September 07, 2021Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: September 21, 2021Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: August 03, 2021Electronic Notice Sent
Date: August 03, 2021Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.