Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gutierrez Esmeralda, filed a(n) case represented by Briones, Samuel, against Terfler Stephen, represented by Henneman, Margaret M., in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Carrie E. Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Case Set On Status Call
Date: November 01, 2021Alias Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: September 20, 2021Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: September 23, 2021Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Alias Summons Issued
Date: August 24, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Case Set On Status Call
Date: September 29, 2021Certificate Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: July 27, 2021Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Other Reason
Date: August 12, 2021Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.