Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brennan, Donald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alfred D Stavros&Assoc, against Folker, Tyler, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Martin S. Agran presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Subpoena Filed
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: March 04, 2022Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Not Listed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: December 08, 2021Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: January 14, 2022Answer And Copy Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Adjudicate Lien - Allowed -
Date: June 22, 2022Jury Demand Filed - Fee Paid
Date: December 08, 2021Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: June 22, 2022New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: June 22, 2022Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: May 06, 2022Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Jury Demand Filed - Fee Paid
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NOT LISTED
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00SUBPOENA FILED
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.