Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kardaschuk, Bohdan, Kralka, Susan, Merva, Volodymyr, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Yakovenko, Ivanna Luba, Yakovenko, Nadia, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Jerry A. Esrig presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryFraud - Jury |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
New Case Filing
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Fraud Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Judgment For Plaintiff
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Citation To Discover Assets Issued
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Alias Citation To Issue
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Citation Continued
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Citation To Discover Assets Issued
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: January 27, 2023Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Placed On Bankruptcy As To Specific Litigant - Allowed
Date: January 27, 2023Citation Continued
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: May 26, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: March 15, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: July 12, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: April 18, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: May 26, 2023Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: March 15, 2023Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: April 18, 2023Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: July 12, 2023Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Fraud Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO ZOOM HEARING - ALLOWED
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00FRAUD COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.