Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cort Business Services Co, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by 1872 River Ridge Cir, , Boznos Law, Naperville Il, 60565, against Howard Corey, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Diane M. Shelley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Commercial Litigation - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Other Commercial Litigation Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Case Removed from Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: March 23, 2022Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: March 23, 2022Petition Filed
Date: March 09, 2022Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Assess Costs - Allowed -
Date: April 22, 2022Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: March 11, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Mailed
Date: March 09, 2022File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Judgment By Prove-Up
Date: March 11, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: February 08, 2022Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00OTHER COMMERCIAL LITIGATION COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.