Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Varela Hilda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by , 33 N Dearborn St Ste, Chicago Il, 60602, Sharon A Kobrin Law Offic, against Rodriguez Carlos, represented by 200 W Jackson # 2050, , Chicago Il, 60606, Labarge Campbell &Lyon Ll, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: June 30, 2022Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: August 29, 2022Answer Interrogatories - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Other Reason
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Court Date To Stand - Allowed
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Case Continued For Pre-Trial
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Case Continued For Pre-Trial
Date: August 03, 2022Subpoena Filed
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Response To Answer Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Alias Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Case Continued For Pre-Trial
Date: June 28, 2022Transferred For Pre-Trial
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Protective Order - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: August 29, 2022Notice Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: June 27, 2022File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Answer Interrogatories - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: June 27, 2022Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Response To Answer Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Case Continued For Pre-Trial
Date: August 15, 2022Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: August 29, 2022ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00RESPONSE TO ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00RESPONSE TO ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.