Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust National, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 1 North Dearborn #12, , Chicago Il, 60602, Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pi, against Olson Scott, Owners And Non-Record Cla, Steenbergen-Olson Michell, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Freddrenna M. Lyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryOwner Occupied Single-Family Home/Condo |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Affidavit Of Special Process Server
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Appt. Selling Officer(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Default(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Judg. Of Foreclosure & Sale(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Judgment Of Foreclosure Entered (Case Is Pending)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Motion To Vacate Non-Final Order/Judgment
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Appearance And Verified AnswerToComplaintMortgageForeclosure
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Order To Appoint Selling Officer - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Dismiss Party(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Affidavit Of Compliance Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Answer To Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: June 28, 2023Summary Judgment - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Affidavit Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: June 28, 2023Motion Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Certificate Filed
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Answer/Reply/Response - Allowed
Date: June 28, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: June 28, 2023Motion Filed
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Continued Generally - Allowed
Date: September 06, 2023Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00***APPT. SELLING OFFICER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00***DISMISS PARTY(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.