Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Thompson Walter, filed a(n) General Chancery case represented by 311 N Aberdeen 3Fl, , Chicago Il, 60607, Loevy & Loevy, against Cook County State'S Attor, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Caroline K. Moreland presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Chancery |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
New Case Filing
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00General Chancery Filed
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Answer To Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Produce Exhibits OrOtherRecordsOrDocumentsOrPerson-Allowed
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Reconsider(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Produce Exhibits OrOtherRecordsOrDocumentsOrPerson-Allowed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Memorandum Of Opinion
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Denied -
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Produce Exhibits OrOtherRecordsOrDocumentsOrPerson-Continued
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Amend - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: April 13, 2023Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: June 30, 2023Agreed Order Entered
Date: March 13, 2023Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: June 01, 2023Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: August 31, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: August 31, 2023Case Set On Status Call
Date: July 24, 2023Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Discovery - Continued -
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: July 24, 2023Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: April 13, 2023Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Quash Writ - Continued -
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: June 01, 2023APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00GENERAL CHANCERY FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.