Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cms, Llc, A Limited Liabi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Teller Levit Silvertrust, against Fifth Third Bank, Glencrest Healthcare And, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Jerry A. Esrig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJerry A. Esrig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract - Non-Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Judgment For A Specific Litigant
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Contract Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Judgment For Plaintiff
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Motion For Appointment Of Special Process Server Filed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Citation Continued
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Citation Continued
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Answer And Copy Filed
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Citation To Discover Assets Issued
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Citation Continued
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Citation Continued
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Summons Served - Corporation/Company/Business
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: October 12, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: August 29, 2022Citation Continued
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: August 29, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Continuance
Date: August 29, 2022Citation Continued
Date: August 29, 2022File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Continuance
Date: October 12, 2022Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Continuance
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Citation Continued
Date: November 30, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: November 30, 2022Citation Continued
Date: October 12, 2022Citation Defendant Dismissed
Date: December 15, 2022Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Judgment For Plaintiff
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Judgment For A Specific Litigant
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Citation Continued
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Contract Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.