Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Castillo Martin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by 10 N Dearborn #500, , Ankin Howard H Atty At La, Chicago Il, 60602, against Thompson Steven, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Moved
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: February 07, 2022Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: February 07, 2022Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: June 29, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: May 24, 2022Certificate Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: June 29, 2022Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: June 29, 2022PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.