Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State?S Attorney Kimberly, filed a(n) General Chancery case represented by Public Defender, against State?S Attorney Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Sophia H. Hall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSophia H. Hall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Chancery |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
New Case Filing
Date: July 14, 2021Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: December 15, 2021Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: July 14, 2021Exhibits Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: July 16, 2021Case Set On Status Call
Date: July 16, 2021Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: October 19, 2021Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Motion To - Allowed -
Date: July 16, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 14, 2021General Chancery Filed
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00GENERAL CHANCERY FILED
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.