Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Benjamin-Koller Deborah, Herrera Josue, Thornley Melissa, filed a(n) Class Actions case represented by Miller Shakman Beem Llp, against Cdw-Government, Llc, Wynndalco Enterprises, Ll, represented by Gould & Ratner, Vedder Price Pc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Raymond W. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2020 |
CategoryClass Actions |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Preliminary Approval Order (Case is Pending) - Allowed
Date: April 22, 2021StrikeOrWithdrawComplaintAmendedComplaintOrPortion - Alw
Date: June 25, 2021Answer/Response/Reply
Date: December 08, 2020Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Voluntary Dismissal, Non-Suit Or Dismissed By Agreement
Date: September 08, 2021Amend - Allowed -
Date: October 30, 2020Dismiss/Strike/Withdraw of Certain Counts - Allowed
Date: June 25, 2021Motion To - Allowed -
Date: June 25, 2021Brief Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Exhibits Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: April 22, 2021Memorandum In Support Of Motion Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Amendment To Complaint Filed
Date: August 05, 2020Agreed Order Entered
Date: September 08, 2021Motion To - Allowed -
Date: April 22, 2021Dismiss(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: September 15, 2020Motion Filed
Date: September 14, 2020Answer/Response/Reply
Date: December 07, 2020Answer/Response/Reply
Date: November 24, 2020Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Class Action Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Certify Class(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00298 Petition Filed - Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00298 Petition Hearing - Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00File Amended Pleading(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference-Allowed
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Continued -
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Amend Order Or Decree - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order Plaintiff Leave To File Petition
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Strike Pleading(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Advance Or Reset On Call
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: June 25, 2021Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: September 08, 2021Continuance - Allowed -
Date: June 25, 2021Advance Or Reset On Call
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Produce Exhibits OrOtherRecordsOrDocumentsOrPerson-Allowed
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: June 25, 2021Appoint Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00***CERTIFY CLASS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00298 PETITION HEARING - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.