Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Semenenko Ivan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Overley Savannah, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: March 07, 2019REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: April 26, 2019ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: April 11, 2019PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: January 24, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: January 24, 2019EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: March 07, 2019SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE IN DISTRICT 3
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00ORDER CAUSE ASSIGNED FOR PROVE-UP IN DIST. 3 CAL W
Date: April 11, 2019PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE IN DISTRICT 3
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: April 11, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: March 07, 2019PROVE UP SET FOR
Date: March 07, 2019EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.