Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Long Kyle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Gwendolyn J Sterk Family, against Long Stephanie, represented by Katz & Stefani, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
SCHEDULED DATE
Date: March 07, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: June 21, 2019STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: March 07, 2019REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: April 09, 2019PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2019NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: June 21, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: March 25, 2019NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: April 09, 2019EXHIBITS FILED
Date: June 21, 2019NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: June 21, 2019ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.