Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miles Glenn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Keys Phyllis, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ORDER FEE'S WAIVED - ALLOWED -
Date: January 08, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2019PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: January 08, 2019CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: April 02, 2019298 PETITION PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: March 07, 2019REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: April 02, 2019ORDER CLERK PAY COST OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: February 19, 2019DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: March 07, 2019PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: February 19, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.